NM SB237 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] DP - PASSED/H (66-0) POCKET VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] DP - PASSED/H (66-0) POCKET VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
"colleges in energy efficiency & bonding act"
Title
"colleges in energy efficiency & bonding act"
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] DP - PASSED/H (66-0) POCKET VETO. | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] HENRC | |
2011-02-21 | [LD 35] PASSED/S (30-3) | |
2011-02-12 | [LD 26] DP/a | |
2011-02-02 | [LD 16] DP-SFC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] SCONC/SFC-SCONC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=237&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0237.pdf |