NM SB236 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-09 - Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Independent Carlsbad Community College
Title
Independent Carlsbad Community College
Sponsors
Sen. Gay Kernan [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-09 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:2 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-17 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC/SFC |