NM SB234 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-20 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 73 - Apr. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-20 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 73 - Apr. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Lottery For Home School Students
Title
Lottery For Home School Students
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 73 - Apr. 6 |
2021-03-20 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:68 N:0 |
2021-03-16 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-14 | House | Sent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC |
2021-03-13 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:41 N:0 |
2021-03-05 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-17 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC/SFC |