NM SB234 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 51] Passed House (62-1) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.5) Ch.211.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

New mexico chile advertising act violations

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

New mexico chile advertising act violations

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-03-14 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 62 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-16House[LD 51] Passed House (62-1) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.5) Ch.211.
2013-03-08House[LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted
2013-03-08House[LD 39] Referred to House Agriculture & Water Resources
2013-03-07Senate[LD 38] Passed Senate (36-0)
2013-03-07Senate[LD 38] Floor amendment adopted
2013-02-15Senate[LD 24] Committee substitute and then to Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted
2013-02-15Senate[LD 24] Do not pass committee report adopted
2013-02-01Senate[LD 14] Referred to Senate Judiciary
2013-02-01Senate[LD 14] Do pass committee report adopted
2013-01-16Senate[LD 2] Referred to Senate Conservation
2013-01-16Senate[LD 2] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Judiciary

New Mexico State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback