NM SB233 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-07 - [LD 14] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 12 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-07 - [LD 14] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Biodiesel tax deduction
Title
Biodiesel tax deduction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-07 | House | [LD 14] Action postponed indefinitely |
2014-02-07 | House | [LD 14] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Passed Senate (38-2) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Finance |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2014-01-24 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2014-01-24 | Senate | [LD 4] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2014-01-24 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2014-01-24 | Senate | [LD 4] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |