NM SB226 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - [LD 19] DP - PASSED/H (48-17) SGND (Feb.26) Ch. 7.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - [LD 19] DP - PASSED/H (48-17) SGND (Feb.26) Ch. 7.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Magistrate courts operations fund & fees
Title
Magistrate courts operations fund & fees
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-12 | [LD 19] DP - PASSED/H (48-17) SGND (Feb.26) Ch. 7. | |
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] HJC | |
2010-02-08 | [LD 15] PASSED/S (39-2) | |
2010-02-01 | [LD 10] DP | |
2010-01-28 | [LD 8] DP/a-SFC | |
2010-01-21 | [LD 3] SCC/SJC/SFC-SCC-germane-SJC |