NM SB224 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-25 - [LD 9] HLELC
Pending: House Local Government, Elections, Land Grants & Cultural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-25 - [LD 9] HLELC
Pending: House Local Government, Elections, Land Grants & Cultural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Register Voters 3 Days Before Elections
Title
Register Voters 3 Days Before Elections
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-25 | House | [LD 9] HLELC |
2017-01-25 | House | [LD 9] HLELC |
2017-02-05 | Senate | [LD 20] Passed Senate (19-11) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-29 | Senate | [LD 13] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2017-01-29 | Senate | [LD 13] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-29 | Senate | [LD 13] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-20 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Rules |
2017-01-20 | Senate | [LD 4] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Public Affairs |