NM SB222 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-11 - HAAWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-11 - HAAWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Retention Of Water Rights Original Documents
Title
Retention Of Water Rights Original Documents
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-11 | House | HAAWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-03-02 | House | Sent to HAAWC - Referrals: HAAWC/HJC |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:37 N:0 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2023-02-16 | Senate | SCONC: Reported by committee without a recommendation |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Sent to SCONC - Referrals: SCONC/SJC |