NM SB220 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Sent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC
Pending: House Consumer & Public Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Sent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC
Pending: House Consumer & Public Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exceptions For Body Cameras
Title
Exceptions For Body Cameras
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House | Sent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC |
2021-03-13 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:30 N:8 |
2021-03-13 | Senate | multiple floor amendments |
2021-03-08 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Sent to SHPAC - Referrals: SHPAC/SJC |