NM SB217 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 10] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 47
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on February 14 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-14 - [LD 10] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 47
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pecan Buyers Licensure Act
Title
Pecan Buyers Licensure Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | Senate | [LD 10] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 47 |
2018-02-14 | House | [LD 10] Passed House (63-1) |
2018-01-31 | House | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-31 | House | [LD 9] Referred to House Agriculture, Water & Wildlife |
2018-01-31 | House | [LD 9] Referred to House Agriculture, Water & Wildlife |
2018-02-13 | Senate | [LD 18] Passed Senate (37-0) |
2018-02-13 | Senate | [LD 18] Floor amendment adopted |
2018-02-10 | Senate | [LD 17] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2018-02-06 | Senate | [LD 12] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2018-02-06 | Senate | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-31 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2018-01-31 | Senate | [LD 9] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-29 | Senate | [LD 8] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2018-01-29 | Senate | [LD 8] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Judiciary |