NM SB211 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-04 - [LD 17] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 77
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 4 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-04 - [LD 17] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 77
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Conform Tax Language To References In Law
Title
Conform Tax Language To References In Law
Sponsors
Sen. John Ryan [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-04 | Senate | [LD 17] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 77 |
2016-02-04 | House | [LD 17] Passed House (65-1) |
2016-02-04 | House | [LD 17] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-01 | House | [LD 14] Referred to House Ways & Means |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Passed Senate (39-0) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-02-02 | Senate | [LD 15] Referred to Senate Finance |
2016-02-02 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2016-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2016-01-22 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2016-01-22 | Senate | [LD 4] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |