NM SB204 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 118 - Apr. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 118 - Apr. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Rural Telecommunications Act
Title
Rural Telecommunications Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 118 - Apr. 7 |
2021-03-17 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:66 N:1 |
2021-03-15 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-11 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-03 | House | Sent to HCEDC - Referrals: HCEDC/HAFC |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:40 N:0 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-10 | Senate | SIRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Referred to: SIRC/STBTC |
2021-02-10 | Senate | SJC ref w/drn |
2021-01-31 | Senate | Sent to SIRC - Referrals: SIRC/SJC |