NM SB202 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 51] Passed House (46-19)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 16 2013 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 51] Passed House (46-19)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Farm-related industries driver's license
Title
Farm-related industries driver's license
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-14 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 46 N: 19 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-20 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 51] Passed House (46-19) |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-25 | House | [LD 30] Referred to House Agriculture & Water Resources |
2013-02-25 | House | [LD 30] Assigned to House Agriculture & Water Resources and then to House Transportation & Public Works |
2013-02-08 | Senate | [LD 19] Passed Senate (41-0) |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-18 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2013-01-18 | Senate | [LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-16 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2013-01-16 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Conservation |