NM SB201 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] DP-HJC- DP - PASSED/H (60-1) POCKET VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] DP-HJC- DP - PASSED/H (60-1) POCKET VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Fire prevention ordinances & code changes
Title
Fire prevention ordinances & code changes
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] DP-HJC- DP - PASSED/H (60-1) POCKET VETO. | |
2011-02-14 | [LD 28] HBIC/HJC-HBIC | |
2011-02-08 | [LD 22] PASSED/S (36-0) | |
2011-02-06 | [LD 20] DP | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] SCORC/SRC-SCORC- DP/a-SRC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=201&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0201.pdf |