NM SB201 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-19 - [LD 24] PASSED/H (55-7) SGND (Mar.8) Ch.77.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-19 - [LD 24] PASSED/H (55-7) SGND (Mar.8) Ch.77.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Electric generating facility gross receipts
Title
Electric generating facility gross receipts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-19 | [LD 24] PASSED/H (55-7) SGND (Mar.8) Ch.77. | |
2010-02-12 | [LD 19] DP-HTRC- DP | |
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] HENRC/HTRC-HENRC | |
2010-02-08 | [LD 15] fl/a- PASSED/S (39-1) | |
2010-02-01 | [LD 10] DNP-CS/DP | |
2010-01-28 | [LD 8] w/drn-SFC | |
2010-01-21 | [LD 3] germane-SCORC | |
2010-01-20 | [LD 2] SCC/SCORC/SFC-SCC |