NM SB198 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-10 - HCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-10 - HCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Anonymity Of Lottery Winners
Title
Anonymity Of Lottery Winners
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Woods [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | House | HCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2023-03-07 | House | Sent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC/HJC |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:34 N:0 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment |
2023-03-04 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2023-02-21 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Sent to SHPAC - Referrals: SHPAC/SJC |