NM SB191 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-02 - [LD 15] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-02 - [LD 15] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Opioid Abuse Prevention & Assisted Treatment
Title
Opioid Abuse Prevention & Assisted Treatment
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Papen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | Senate | [LD 15] Action postponed indefinitely |
2016-02-02 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-01-28 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2016-01-28 | Senate | [LD 10] WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted |
2016-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2016-01-23 | Senate | [LD 5] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2016-01-21 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2016-01-21 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=191&year=16 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/16%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0191.pdf |