NM SB190 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-10 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2024 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-10 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Dwi Act
Title
Dwi Act
Sponsors
Sen. Gregory Baca [R] | Sen. Craig Brandt [R] | Rep. Dayan Hochman-Vigil [D] | Sen. Daniel Ivey-Soto [D] |
Rep. Andrea Reeb [R] | Rep. William Rehm [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-10 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-10 | House | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2024-02-10 | House | Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC |
2024-02-10 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:26 N:8 |
2024-02-09 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2024-01-30 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SHPAC/SJC |