NM SB188 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] DP-HTRC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] DP-HTRC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Vendor fee for game & fish license collectors
Title
Vendor fee for game & fish license collectors
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] DP-HTRC API. | |
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] HBIC/HTRC-HBIC | |
2011-02-13 | [LD 27] PASSED/S (35-1) | |
2011-02-11 | [LD 25] DP | |
2011-02-06 | [LD 20] DP/a-SFC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] SCONC/SFC-SCONC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=188&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0188.pdf |