NM SB181 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - [LD 11] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - [LD 11] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Due process for medicaid fraud allegations
Title
Due process for medicaid fraud allegations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Action postponed indefinitely |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Referred to Senate Finance |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-04 | Senate | [LD 11] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-31 | Senate | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-01-31 | Senate | [LD 9] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2014-01-27 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2014-01-27 | Senate | [LD 5] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance |