NM SB176 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 30 - Feb. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 30 - Feb. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Athletic Competition Act Changes
Title
Athletic Competition Act Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2024-02-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 30 - Feb. 29 |
2024-02-13 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:63 N:3 |
2024-02-12 | House | HCEDC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-02-10 | House | Sent to HCEDC - Referrals: HCEDC |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:20 N:16 |
2024-02-07 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-02-01 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2024-01-24 | Senate | SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SHPAC/STBTC |