NM SB172 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-14 - Failed to Pass in the Senate, Bill Has Died
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-14 - Failed to Pass in the Senate, Bill Has Died
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
No Detaining For Fed Immigration Violations
Title
No Detaining For Fed Immigration Violations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 18 N: 20 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-14 | Senate | Failed to Pass in the Senate, Bill Has Died |
2023-03-07 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2023-02-09 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Sent to SHPAC - Referrals: SHPAC/SJC |