NM SB170 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-15 - Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-15 - Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increase Juror Compensation
Title
Increase Juror Compensation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-15 | House | Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:32 N:2 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-02-02 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Sent to SJC - Referrals: SJC/SFC |