NM SB17 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on January 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-29 - [LD 8] Passed House (48-19) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on January 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-29 - [LD 8] Passed House (48-19) Vetoed by the Governor and date.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Gross Receipts For Certain Nonprofits
Title
Gross Receipts For Certain Nonprofits
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-02-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | House | [LD 8] Passed House (48-19) Vetoed by the Governor and date. |
2018-01-29 | House | [LD 8] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-02-05 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2018-02-05 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2018-02-02 | Senate | [LD 11] Passed Senate (31-4) |
2018-02-02 | Senate | [LD 11] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-29 | Senate | [LD 8] Referred to Senate Finance |
2018-01-29 | Senate | [LD 8] Do pass committee report adopted |
2018-01-18 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2018-01-18 | Senate | [LD 3] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2018-01-16 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2018-01-16 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |
2018-01-16 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |