NM SB167 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 53] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 53] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Rural health tax credit for social workers
Title
Rural health tax credit for social workers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 53] Action postponed indefinitely |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 53] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-01-31 | Senate | [LD 13] Referred to Senate Finance |
2013-01-31 | Senate | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-16 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2013-01-16 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |