NM SB167 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - [LD 44] s/cncrd SGND (Apr.7) Ch.126.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-02 - [LD 44] s/cncrd SGND (Apr.7) Ch.126.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Equal pre-k program appropriations
Title
Equal pre-k program appropriations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] s/cncrd SGND (Apr.7) Ch.126. | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] DP/a - PASSED/H (68-0) | |
2011-02-18 | [LD 32] HEC | |
2011-02-11 | [LD 25] PASSED/S (36-0) | |
2011-02-07 | [LD 21] DP | |
2011-01-29 | [LD 12] DP/a-SFC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] SEC/SFC-SEC |