NM SB162 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - [LD 21] Failed passage in Senate (19-22).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-14 - [LD 21] Failed passage in Senate (19-22).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Probation officer maximum case load
Title
Probation officer maximum case load
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | [LD 21] Failed passage in Senate (19-22). | |
2012-02-13 | [LD 20] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Judiciary | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-24 | [LD 6] Referred to Senate Public Affairs | |
2012-01-24 | [LD 6] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=162&year=12 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/12%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0162.pdf |