NM SB160 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 7 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-07 - [LD 14] Passed House (60-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 7) Ch. 43.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 7 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-07 - [LD 14] Passed House (60-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 7) Ch. 43.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Magistrate retirement changes
Title
Magistrate retirement changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-19 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-07 | House | [LD 14] Passed House (60-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 7) Ch. 43. |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2014-02-12 | Senate | [LD 17] Passed Senate (39-0) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | [LD 15] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Finance |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-24 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-01-24 | Senate | [LD 4] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Judiciary and then to Senate Finance |