NM SB158 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 19 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - [LD 43] Passed House (57-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 9) Ch.109.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 19 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-19 - [LD 43] Passed House (57-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 9) Ch.109.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public works project claim evidence standards
Title
Public works project claim evidence standards
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-19 | House | [LD 43] Passed House (57-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 9) Ch.109. |
2015-03-19 | House | [LD 43] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-16 | House | [LD 40] HBEC |
2015-03-16 | House | [LD 40] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-23 | House | [LD 25] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works |
2015-02-23 | House | [LD 25] Assigned to House Transportation & Public Works and then to HBEC |
2015-02-18 | Senate | [LD 22] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Judiciary |
2015-01-20 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |