NM SB158 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on February 6 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - [LD 13] Passed House (65-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 5) Ch. 12.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 6 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-06 - [LD 13] Passed House (65-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 5) Ch. 12.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Dual credit program parity
Title
Dual credit program parity
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-18 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (65-0) SGND BY GOV (Mar. 5) Ch. 12. |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-02-06 | House | [LD 13] Referred to House Education |
2014-02-03 | Senate | [LD 10] Passed Senate (38-0) |
2014-01-31 | Senate | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted |
2014-01-27 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Education |
2014-01-27 | Senate | [LD 5] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2014-01-27 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2014-01-27 | Senate | [LD 5] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2014-01-22 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Education |