NM SB153 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (65-1) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 8) Ch. 74.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (65-1) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 8) Ch. 74.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Streamline teacher administrative licensure
Title
Streamline teacher administrative licensure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 65 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Passed House (65-1) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 8) Ch. 74. |
2015-03-19 | House | [LD 43] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-17 | House | [LD 41] Referred to House Education |
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] Passed Senate (39-0) |
2015-03-16 | Senate | [LD 40] fl and then to sub adptd |
2015-02-09 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Finance |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Education |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Education and then to Senate Finance |
2015-01-20 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |