NM SB152 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 55] Passed House (66-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.2) Ch.107.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 55] Passed House (66-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.2) Ch.107.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Office of guardianship fund
Title
Office of guardianship fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-16 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 55] Passed House (66-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.2) Ch.107. |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 51] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 51] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 51] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 50] Referred to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 50] Assigned to House Health, Government & Indian Affairs and then to House Appropriations & Finance |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Passed Senate (37-0) |
2013-03-11 | Senate | [LD 40] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Referred to Senate Finance |
2013-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-16 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2013-01-16 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Finance |