NM SB146 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on February 14 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-02-14 - Action Postponed Indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hospital Acceptance Of Health Plans
Title
Hospital Acceptance Of Health Plans
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | Senate | Action Postponed Indefinitely |
2024-02-14 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:38 N:24 |
2024-02-13 | House | HCPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2024-02-13 | House | Sent to HCPAC - Referrals: HCPAC |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:21 N:16 |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Floor substitute adopted |
2024-02-09 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2024-02-06 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-01-29 | Senate | SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SHPAC/STBTC |