NM SB146 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 51 - Mar. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-02-20 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 51 - Mar. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Subsidized Guardianships
Title
Subsidized Guardianships
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-20 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 51 - Mar. 6 |
2020-02-20 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:70 N:0 |
2020-02-18 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2020-02-18 | House | Sent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC |
2020-02-16 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:41 N:0 |
2020-02-15 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2020-02-07 | Senate | SPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SPAC/SJC |