NM SB142 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - [LD 52] DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-10 - [LD 52] DP API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limit certain special education program units
Title
Limit certain special education program units
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-10 | [LD 52] DP API. | |
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] HEC/HAFC-HEC- DP/a-HAFC | |
2011-03-02 | [LD 44] fl/a- PASSED/S (41-0) | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] DP/a | |
2011-02-02 | [LD 16] DP/a-SFC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] SEC/SFC-SEC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=142&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0142.pdf |