NM SB139 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - [LD 41] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-17 - [LD 41] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Foster-care coverage for certain people
Title
Foster-care coverage for certain people
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | House | [LD 41] Action postponed indefinitely |
2015-03-17 | Senate | [LD 41] Passed Senate (24-0) |
2015-03-13 | Senate | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Finance |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Finance |
2015-01-20 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |