NM SB137 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - [LD 19] DP-HJC- DP - PASSED/H (61-0) SGND (Mar.8) Ch.70.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-12 - [LD 19] DP-HJC- DP - PASSED/H (61-0) SGND (Mar.8) Ch.70.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alternative driver's license renewal
Title
Alternative driver's license renewal
Sponsors
Sen. Phil Griego [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-12 | [LD 19] DP-HJC- DP - PASSED/H (61-0) SGND (Mar.8) Ch.70. | |
2010-02-10 | [LD 17] HCPAC/HJC-HCPAC | |
2010-02-01 | [LD 10] DP - PASSED/S (39-2) | |
2010-01-21 | [LD 3] DP-SFC | |
2010-01-20 | [LD 2] SCC/SCORC/SFC-SCC-germane-SCORC |