NM SB131 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-14 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 14 2021 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-14 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Discretionary School Funding Program Units
Title
Discretionary School Funding Program Units
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-14 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor |
2021-03-14 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:64 N:0 |
2021-03-10 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-04 | House | HEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-25 | House | Sent to HEC - Referrals: HEC/HTRC |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0 |
2021-02-17 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-01 | Senate | SEC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Sent to SEC - Referrals: SEC/SFC |