NM SB129 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (52-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 6) Ch. 46.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on March 24 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-24 - [LD 46] Passed House (52-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 6) Ch. 46.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
School district liens on some school buses
Title
School district liens on some school buses
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-20 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Passed House (52-0) SGND BY GOV (Apr. 6) Ch. 46. |
2015-03-24 | House | [LD 46] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-03-17 | House | [LD 41] Referred to House Education |
2015-03-17 | House | [LD 41] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-02-23 | House | [LD 25] Referred to House Transportation & Public Works |
2015-02-23 | House | [LD 25] Assigned to House Transportation & Public Works and then to House Education |
2015-02-18 | Senate | [LD 22] Passed Senate (41-0) |
2015-02-18 | Senate | [LD 22] Motion to reconsider previous action adopted |
2015-02-18 | Senate | [LD 22] Failed passage in Senate (10-30) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | [LD 15] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2015-01-26 | Senate | [LD 5] Do pass committee report adopted |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Education |
2015-01-22 | Senate | [LD 3] Assigned to Senate Education and then to Senate Judiciary |
2015-01-20 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |