NM SB127 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 26 - Feb. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 26 - Feb. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Professional Psychologist Act Changes
Title
Professional Psychologist Act Changes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-06 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 26 - Feb. 29 |
2024-02-14 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:57 N:4 |
2024-02-12 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-02-09 | House | HHHC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-02-06 | House | Sent to HHHC - Referrals: HHHC/HJC |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:36 N:0 |
2024-02-03 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-02-01 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2024-01-25 | Senate | SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session |
2024-01-22 | Senate | Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SHPAC/SJC |