NM SB126 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-28 - [LD 12] Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-28 - [LD 12] Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change Livestock & Animal Definitions
Title
Change Livestock & Animal Definitions
Sponsors
Sen. Pat Woods [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Referred to House Judiciary |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] HSIVC |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] HSIVC and then to House Judiciary |
2017-02-10 | Senate | [LD 25] Passed Senate (32-2) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | [LD 22] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-26 | Senate | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-26 | Senate | [LD 10] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-26 | Senate | [LD 10] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2017-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Judiciary |
2017-01-24 | Senate | [LD 8] Referred to Senate Public Affairs Assigned toerral Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2017-01-18 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2017-01-18 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Public Affairs |