NM SB124 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-28 - [LD 12] HLELC
Pending: House Local Government, Elections, Land Grants & Cultural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 26 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-01-28 - [LD 12] HLELC
Pending: House Local Government, Elections, Land Grants & Cultural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Local Option For Liquor Sales Hours
Title
Local Option For Liquor Sales Hours
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] HLELC |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] HSIVC |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] HSIVC and then to HLELC |
2017-01-26 | Senate | [LD 10] Passed Senate (38-0) |
2017-01-26 | Senate | [LD 10] Floor amendment adopted |
2017-01-25 | Senate | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-20 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2017-01-20 | Senate | [LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-18 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Indian & Cultural Affairs |
2017-01-18 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Indian & Cultural Affairs and then to Senate Corporations & Transportation |