NM SB124 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] DP-HJC- DP - PASSED/H (33-22) VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] DP-HJC- DP - PASSED/H (33-22) VETO.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
5 feet for cars to pass bicycles
Title
5 feet for cars to pass bicycles
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Wirth [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] DP-HJC- DP - PASSED/H (33-22) VETO. | |
2011-02-06 | [LD 20] HCPAC/HJC-HCPAC | |
2011-01-29 | [LD 12] PASSED/S (20-17) | |
2011-01-22 | [LD 5] DP | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] DP-SJC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] SCORC/SJC-SCORC |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=124&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0124.pdf |