NM SB121 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 43 - Apr. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-19 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 43 - Apr. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State Transportation Bonds For Projects
Title
State Transportation Bonds For Projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-19 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 43 - Apr. 5 |
2021-03-19 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:69 N:0 |
2021-03-15 | House | HTRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-10 | House | HTPWC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-03-03 | House | Sent to HTPWC - Referrals: HTPWC/HTRC |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:39 N:0 |
2021-03-01 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-02-17 | Senate | STBTC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Sent to STBTC - Referrals: STBTC/SJC |