NM SB12 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Vetoed on February 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-13 - [LD 28] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on February 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-13 - [LD 28] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Pocket veto by the Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Legal Services For Land Grants & Acequias
Title
Legal Services For Land Grants & Acequias
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-11 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-13 | Senate | [LD 28] Senate has concurred in House amendments on a Senate bill Pocket veto by the Governor. |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Passed House (58-0) |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Floor amendment adopted |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] HLELC |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] HLELC |
2017-01-28 | House | [LD 12] Referred to House Appropriations & Finance Assigned to Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] HLELC |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] HLELC and then to House Appropriations & Finance |
2017-02-07 | Senate | [LD 22] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | [LD 17] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-20 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Finance |
2017-01-20 | Senate | [LD 4] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Conservation |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Conservation and then to Senate Finance |
2017-01-17 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |