NM SB119 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] DP-HHGAC- DP - PASSED/H (62-0) SGND (Apr.7) Ch.122.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-05 - [LD 47] DP-HHGAC- DP - PASSED/H (62-0) SGND (Apr.7) Ch.122.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Retirement beneficiary designation of spouse
Title
Retirement beneficiary designation of spouse
Sponsors
Sen. John Sapien [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-05 | [LD 47] DP-HHGAC- DP - PASSED/H (62-0) SGND (Apr.7) Ch.122. | |
2011-02-23 | [LD 37] HLC/HHGAC-HLC | |
2011-02-13 | [LD 27] PASSED/S (38-2) | |
2011-02-12 | [LD 26] DP/a | |
2011-02-06 | [LD 20] DP/a-SFC | |
2011-01-22 | [LD 5] DP-SPAC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] SEC/SPAC/SFC-SEC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] SPREF |