NM SB114 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-26 - [LD 8] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-26 - [LD 8] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adjunct Secondary Instructors Act
Title
Adjunct Secondary Instructors Act
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Griggs [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-26 | Senate | [LD 8] Action postponed indefinitely |
2016-01-26 | Senate | [LD 8] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-01-26 | Senate | [LD 8] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2016-01-21 | Senate | [LD 3] Referred to Senate Education |
2016-01-21 | Senate | [LD 3] Ruled germane to bills which fall within the purview of a 30-day session |
2016-01-20 | Senate | [LD 2] Referred to Senate Committees' Committee |
2016-01-20 | Senate | [LD 2] Assigned to Senate Committees' Committee and then to Senate Education and then to Senate Judiciary |
2016-01-19 | Senate | [LD 1] Senate Pre-file |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Legislation/Legislation?chamber=S&legtype=B&legno=114&year=16 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/16%20Regular/bills/senate/SB0114.pdf |