NM SB108 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 24 - Feb. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on February 29 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-02-29 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 24 - Feb. 29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Distribution To Election Fund
Title
Distribution To Election Fund
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-14 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 24 - Feb. 29 |
2024-02-14 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:59 N:5 |
2024-02-13 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-02-08 | House | Sent to HAFC - Referrals: HAFC |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:41 N:0 |
2024-02-05 | Senate | SFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2024-01-29 | Senate | SRC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2024-01-22 | Senate | SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SRC/SFC |