NM SB107 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-08 - [LD 39] Passed House (61-0) Signed by one or both houses (Mar.26) Ch. 38.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-08 - [LD 39] Passed House (61-0) Signed by one or both houses (Mar.26) Ch. 38.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform real property transfer on death
Title
Uniform real property transfer on death
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Wirth [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-11 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Passed House (61-0) Signed by one or both houses (Mar.26) Ch. 38. |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-13 | House | [LD 22] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Passed Senate (38-0) |
2013-02-01 | Senate | [LD 14] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-01-18 | Senate | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-01-18 | Senate | [LD 4] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-01-15 | Senate | [LD 1] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2013-01-15 | Senate | [LD 1] Assigned to Senate Public Affairs and then to Senate Judiciary |