NM SB103 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-28 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 13 - Feb. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-28 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 13 - Feb. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Workforce Solutions Staff Background Checks
Title
Workforce Solutions Staff Background Checks
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | Senate | Signed by Governor - Chapter 13 - Feb. 28 |
2022-02-15 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:62 N:0 |
2022-02-14 | House | HJC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-02-10 | House | Sent to HJC - Referrals: HJC |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:38 N:0 |
2022-02-08 | Senate | SJC: Reported by committee with Do Not Pass but with a Do Pass recommendation on Committee Substitution |
2022-02-03 | Senate | SHPAC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | SCC: Reported by committee to fall within the purview of a 30 day session |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Sent to SCC - Referrals: SCC/SHPAC/SJC |